judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SENNECA BENJAMIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0129
Short Caption:SENNECA BENJAMIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-9767-09Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/08/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSenneca Benjamin YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ann K. H. SimonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sharon Burka, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to February 7, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 17, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/12/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT NO OPPO
04/12/2011RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcripts
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
04/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
04/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (30 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/28/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (482 pgs/Pirfo) 11/1-4/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (38 pgs/Van Bremen) 11/8/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (19 pgs/Van Bremen) 11/10/10 proc. w/cd
05/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/17/2011RECORD COPIES
05/17/2011RECORD INDEX
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 21, 2011 (no oppo)
06/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 21, 2011. (Castillo)
07/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/21/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until completetion and receipt of transcripts (Titled: as Motion to Stay) (Appellee)
09/29/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (20 pgs/Shelton) 1/26/11 proc.
10/06/2011FiledOrder Denying Appellee's motion to stay briefing as moot.
10/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/07/2011FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/13/2012FiledSubmitted To Judge Oberly,Beckwith,Terry
07/16/2013FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge.)
07/26/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
08/08/2013FiledMandate