judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BACON (TROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36387
Short Caption:BACON (TROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40422
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 98CR0089Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/06/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11542
08/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Nathan Tod Young shall within 10 days from the date of this order enter an appearance in this court or inform this court that he not appointed for this appeal. 00-14560
09/01/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice to the Court. Nathan Tod Young informs the court that he has not been appointed to represent appellant. 00-15496
09/15/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Mark B. Jackson hereby gives his notice of appearance as counsel of record. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-16326
01/02/2001MotionFiled Motion. 01-00023
05/01/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion of attorney Mark B. Jackson to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant. The clerk of this court shall amend the docket in this appeal to reflect the fact that attorney Jackson is no longer counsel of record for appellant. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel in the district court, the clerk of the district court shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's new counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance with this court. All filing deadlines, including those set forth in NRAP 9, NRAP 14, and NRAP 31(a)(1), shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court. On December 7, 2000, and February 2, 2001, appellant submitted, in proper person, documents related to the appointment of counsel in this matter. In light of this order, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, those proper person documents. Once counsel is appointed or retained, appellant shall proceed through counsel in this matter. 01-07278
05/01/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Troy Allen Bacon. Returned unfiled, the original Proper Person Request for Status Check received December 7, 2000, and the Request for Appointment of New Counsel received February 2, 2001.
05/14/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 9, 2001. The law firm of Roeser & Roeser is appointed to represent Troy Allen Bacon. 01-08010
05/23/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Terri Steik Roeser of Roeser & Roeser. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-08630
06/06/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-09402
06/18/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/21/98. To Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 01-10139
08/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Ms. Wilder has not filed the transcript requested of her. Ms. Wilder shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts for proceedings conducted on September 21, 1998. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, Ms. Wilder shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Wilder shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 01-14317
08/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 18, 2001, appellant in Docket No. 36387 filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of a transcript by court reporter Joan Wilder. Further review of our records indicates that the requested transcript was inadvertently filed in Docket No. 38211 on August 3, 2001. We vacate the August 23, 2001, order entered in Docket No. 36387. The clerk of this court shall remove the certified transcript for proceedings conducted on September 21, 1998, from Docket No. 38211 and file the transcript in Docket No. 36387. Nos. 36387/38211. 01-14692
08/30/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 21, 1998. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 01-14693
09/17/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 09/17/01. 01-15713
09/17/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-15714
10/04/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/04/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-16729
10/04/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-16731
11/06/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 11/06/01. 01-18495
11/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this case. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20033
12/26/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20109
12/26/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2001. 01-20109