judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFREY JAMES FULLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0169)
Case Number:S-09-0169Case Docketed On:08/31/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JEFFREY JAMES FULLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEFFREY JAMES FULLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffrey James FullerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin Ashkhan Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Crimes
Opinion Number:2010 WY 55
Citation:230 P.3d 309

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/31/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/19/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
12/01/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - D. Michael Pauling and Justin A. Daraie, Student Intern for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Terry Armitage, Deputy Attorney General and Justin A. Daraie, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Daraie for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/11/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
05/11/2010Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
05/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Brief in Support of Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/27/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/26/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal