judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ORLANDO WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0123
Short Caption:ORLANDO WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6846-05Filed Date:02/02/2011

Opening Event Date:02/02/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOrlando Williams YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4 (b). (BY: ETW)
02/17/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/02/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's)
03/09/2011 ORDERED that this appeal is hereby DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4. (GLPRFE) (rm)
03/09/2011DISMISSED
03/31/2011MANDATE ISSUED