judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUCKMASTER (BRETT) VS. STATE C/W 36394

Case Information: 36381
Short Caption:BUCKMASTER (BRETT) VS. STATE C/W 36394Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:36381*, 36394 Related Case(s): 37305
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR992257Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11377
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-11627
07/18/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. to consolidate appeals. Nos. 36381, 36394. 00-12401
07/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. On July 18, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation to consolidate these appeals. The stipulation is approved, and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Counsel for appellant shall file a single fast track statement within 30 days of this order. Nos. 36381, 36394. 00-12821
08/07/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 4/27/00 (2) and 6/1/00. Court Reporter: Debbie P. Vieira. (36394/36381). Placed in case no. 36394. 00-13648
08/25/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. (nos. 36381/36394). 00-14978
08/25/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (nos. 36381/36394). 00-14979
09/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 36381 and 36394. 00-15583
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. To the extent that appellant contends that the sentencing judge may have misunderstood the length of time appellant would be incarcerated if given concurrent sentences, we conclude that the record does not demonstrate any such confusion. "We therefore affirm the judgments of conviction." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB Nos. 36381, 36394. 00-17298
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (Nos. 36381 and 36394) 00-17364
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 3, 2000. 00-17364