judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDREW ELI GOMEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0162)
Case Number:S-09-0162Case Docketed On:08/20/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:ANDREW ELI GOMEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANDREW ELI GOMEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndrew Eli GomezDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Juvenile Court, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 108
Citation:237 P.3d 393

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/20/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/06/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/20/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/23/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/30/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham M. Smith, Assistant Attorney General, for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
03/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/19/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/19/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
11/08/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court notice of filing petitionNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
12/17/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal