judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HOYT L. AGNEW v. COLEMAN COUNTY ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC.

Case: A-4572
A-4572
03/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
HOYT L. AGNEW
COLEMAN COUNTY ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/10/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/27/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/14/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/20/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/10/1954Motion for Rehearing
11/24/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
11/24/1954Opinion issued
08/27/1954Supplemental Brief filed
06/14/1954Response to Brief filed
04/28/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/28/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1954Supplemental Brief filed
03/27/1954Response to Petition
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hoyt L. AgnewPetitioner
Coleman County Electric Cooperative, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information