judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS v. GULF OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case: A-4575
A-4575
03/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
GULF OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/28/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/29/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/26/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/30/1954Response to Motion filed
04/28/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/29/1954Reply to Response
03/26/1954Response to Petition
03/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GULF OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information