judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEALL (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36382
Short Caption:BEALL (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52644 , 54688 , 54899 , 63662
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR91396Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11378
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15280
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15445
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 28, 2000. 00-15445
02/16/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter dated February 14, 2001.