judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL LEROY HACKETT a.k.a MICHAEL LEROY HACKETT, JR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0163)
Case Number:S-09-0163Case Docketed On:08/21/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL LEROY HACKETT a.k.a MICHAEL LEROY HACKETT, JR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL LEROY HACKETT a.k.a MICHAEL LEROY HACKETT, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael L. Hackett Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Amy Gleason

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2010 WY 90
Citation:233 P.3d 988

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/21/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/08/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Amy Gleason to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/20/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/09/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/14/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/29/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/15/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal