judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GRACE NEWMAN V. KATHRYN HARRIS

Case Information: 11-CV-0124
Short Caption:GRACE NEWMAN V. KATHRYN HARRISClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5080-02Filed Date:01/24/2011

Opening Event Date:01/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/29/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/22/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/10/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGrace Newman NPro SeN
AppelleeKathryn Harris N
Adam K. Levin NN
Dana Carver Boehm YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/24/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/15/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 24, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
02/24/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Brief.
02/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/18/05) (elp)
03/28/2011APPEARANCE- of Kathryn Harris on behalf of aple
03/29/2011RECORD INDEX
03/29/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/31/2011RECEIVED - APLE'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX
04/06/2011 On consideration of the lodged brief of appellant, the lodged brief of appellee and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the lodged brief of appellant is filed. It is (MORE)
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/06/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the lodged brief of appellee and the appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
04/06/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/06/2011APPENDIX
04/06/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC) elp
04/06/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/22/2011FiledSubmitted ToBlackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Schwelb
05/02/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge)
05/10/2012FiledMotion To Reconsider (Appellant) (construed as a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc)Denied
08/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
08/10/2012FiledMandate