judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDREW A. WALLACE-MAYO V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 08-CF-1545
Short Caption:ANDREW A. WALLACE-MAYO V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-23782-06Filed Date:12/04/2008

Opening Event Date:12/04/2008Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/24/2009Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/16/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndrew A. Wallace-Mayo YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Angela M. Miller YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/04/2008NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/11/2008 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: GP)
12/17/2008STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11 pgs/Swaringer - 5/30/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (295 pgs/Burr - 8/25/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (pgs 296 thru 527/Burr - 8/26/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (pgs 528 thru 743/Burr - 8/27/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (pgs 744 thru 965/Burr - 8/28/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (149 pgs/Warren - 8/29/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (34 pgs/Ramos - 9/2/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (50 pgs/Ramos - 9/3/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (22 pgs/Ramos - 9/4/08 proc.)
07/16/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (31 pgs/Tape - 11/7/08 proc.)
07/24/2009RECORD COMPLETED
07/24/2009RECORD INDEX
07/24/2009RECORD COPIES
08/07/2009 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP)
09/16/2009APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
09/22/2009 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 15, 2009. (GP)
12/15/2009APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days no oppo
12/22/2009 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 15, 2010. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (GP)
03/15/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
03/22/2010 On consideration of appellant unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 14, 2010. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW)
06/14/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
06/24/2010 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and it appearing that this court issued the briefing order on August 7, 2009, and that counsel has repeatedly filed motions for extensions of time, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that the appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be field by September 7, 2010, or counsel shall show cause why he should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with this court's order. (ETW)
08/23/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (supplemental)
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (12 pgs/Janifer) 10/5/07 proc.
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (16 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 10/9/07 proc.
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (201 pgs/Swaringer) 10/11/07 proc.
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (29 pgs/Swaringer) 10/12/07 proc.
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (230 pgs/Schertzer) 10/15/07 proc.
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (20 pgs/tape) 10/22/07 proc.
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (20 pgs/tape) 10/23/07 proc. w/cd
08/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (14 pgs/tape) 8/25/08 proc.
09/07/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/07/2010APPENDIX
10/07/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
10/07/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/09/2010FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
11/09/2010 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of January 2011 through March 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by NOV. 22, 2010, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
11/19/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo
03/03/2011RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief.
03/16/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/16/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Washington, Glickman, King Jessica Brand, Esq. for appellant Angela M. Miller, Esq. for appellee
03/17/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is filed. (JAC)
03/17/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
03/28/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and King, Senior Judge.)
04/05/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
04/11/2011APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB to 60 days. no oppo
04/13/2011ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB on or before June 10, 2011. (WH)
10/03/2011FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate Based on Ineffective Assistance of Counsel. (Appellant)Denied
10/04/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
11/29/2011FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE