judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

B. N. MASON v. YELLOW CAB AND BAGGAGE COMPANY

Case: A-4551
A-4551
03/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
B. N. MASON
YELLOW CAB AND BAGGAGE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/26/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/02/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/20/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/09/1954Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
05/26/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/19/1954Opinion issued
04/02/1954Reply to Response
03/20/1954Response to Petition
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Yellow Cab and Baggage CompanyRespondent
B. N. MasonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information