judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARTWELL (KENNETH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36402
Short Caption:HARTWELL (KENNETH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P1771Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/18/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/11/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11912
08/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36402, 36403, 36404, 36405, 36448. 00-13619
08/17/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-14533
08/18/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn5[We have considered all proper person document filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 36402/36403/36404-these cases are not consolidated. 02-02968
03/29/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40( c). fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 36402/36403/36404-cases are not consolidated. 02-05611
04/16/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05722
04/16/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/24/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on on April 19, 2002. 02-05722