judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFREY D. HOLLOWAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0185)
Case Number:S-09-0185Case Docketed On:09/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JEFFREY D. HOLLOWAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEFFREY D. HOLLOWAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffrey D. HollowayDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct
Opinion Number:2010 WY 150
Citation:243 P.3d 945

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/28/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
11/12/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/15/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/08/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/08/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/10/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal