judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OPHELIA TARPEH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0145
Short Caption:OPHELIA TARPEH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-17007-09Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/29/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/15/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOpelia Tarpeh N
Emmanuel D. Akpan YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Angela Pegram Saffoe NN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz NN
Shane N. WallerYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL and TO STAY LW
02/15/2011TMC - EMERGENCY motion for release AND TO STAY
02/15/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/18/2011On consdieration of appellant's motion for release pending appeal and the opposition filed by appellee is Superior Court, it is ORDERED that the motion for release pending appeal is denied. SEE ORDER (GLTHTE)
02/22/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion for release and stay pending appeal after judgment of conviction
02/25/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC)
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (7 pgs/tape) 6/16/10 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (12 pgs/tape) 7/7/10 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (9 pgs/tape) 7/28/10 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (37 pgs/tape) 1/24/11 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (147 pgs/tape) 1/25/11 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (122 pgs/tape) 1/26/11 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (83 pgs/tape) 1/28/11 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (73 pgs/tape) 1/31/11 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (48 pgs/tape) 2/1/11 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (15 pgs/tape) 2/7/11 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (3 pgs/tape) 2/14/11 proc. w/cd
03/29/2011RECORD INDEX
03/29/2011RECORD COPIES
03/29/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (unopposed)
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 23, 2011. (JAC)
06/24/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/24/2011APPENDIX
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/25/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/15/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/07/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
12/29/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record w/ document attached (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledMemorandum of substitution of counsel for oral argument, Atty Waller in place of Atty Schwartz (Appellee)
01/09/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (amended) (Appellant)
01/12/2012FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Fisher and Steadman
01/17/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion to supplement the record.
03/21/2013FiledReversed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
04/15/2013FiledMandate