judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DICKEY VS. DICKEY

Case Information: 36397
Short Caption:DICKEY VS. DICKEYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33693 , 33695 , 33997 , 35937
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9600503Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kathleen S. Trimmer-check no. 2048.
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11631
08/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13408
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13698
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13698