judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEGGY A. ROHRER v. BUREAUS INVESTMENT, GROUP NO. 7, LLC

Case Heading (S-09-0180)
Case Number:S-09-0180Case Docketed On:09/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:PEGGY A. ROHRER v. BUREAUS INVESTMENT, GROUP NO. 7, LLC
Full Title:PEGGY A. ROHRER, Appellant (Defendant), v. BUREAUS INVESTMENT, GROUP NO. 7, LLC, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeggy A. RohrerJohn Mortensen Burman
Carissa Mobley
AppelleeBureaus Investment, Group No. 7, LLCLarry W. Harrington

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure
Opinion Number:2010 WY 96
Citation:235 P.3d 861

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/16/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client fro Carissa Mobley to appear on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
10/30/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief for Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/20/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry Harrington for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Carissa Mobley, Student Intern for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John Burman and Carissa Mobley, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Mobley for appellant; Larry Harrington for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/07/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/23/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/26/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal