judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT D. SCOTT V. HON. LEE F. SATTERFIELD, ET AL

Case Information: 11-OA-0003
Short Caption:ROBERT D. SCOTT V. HON. LEE F. SATTERFIELD, ET ALClassification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:02/09/2011

Opening Event Date:02/09/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRobert D. Scott NPro SeN
RespondentLee F. Satterfield N
RespondentRobert E. Morin N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/09/2011PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS Denied
02/09/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
02/10/2011TMC - petition for writ of mandamus
02/22/2011FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/22/2011 ORDERED that the PWM IS HEREBY DENIED. Petitioner has not established an indiputable right to be accepted for inclusion on the re-established Criminal Justice Act Panel...SEE HARDCOPY (GLTHTE) (rm)
03/14/2011RECEIVED- petitoner's for rehearing en banc
03/14/2011PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING EB
05/13/2011ORDER deny petitioner's pro se petition for rehearing en banc and grant petitioner's motion to reconsider, vacate or modify the Clerk's return of the petition to the extent that the Clerk is directed to file the lodged petition. (WHRZGLFIBRTHOBRDKR) (Judge Reid became Associate Judge, Retired, on April 7, 2011. Judge Kramer became Associate Judge, Retired, on May 1, 2011.)
05/13/2011PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC (pro se petition)