judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PEPCO V. KELVIN WHEELER

Case Information: 11-AA-0140
Short Caption:PEPCO V. KELVIN WHEELERClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES2933-10Filed Date:02/08/2011

Opening Event Date:02/08/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerPotomac Electric Power CompanyN
Kirk J. EmgeNN
Jill D. FlackNN
RespondentKelvin Wheeler NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/08/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
02/08/2011FILING FEE OF $100.00 paid
02/09/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim - OAG and OAH
02/17/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
03/08/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/25/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this petitionf or review is hereby dismissed and the case is remanded to the Office of Administrative Hearings with direction to re-enter its February 22, 2011 order upon transfer of jurisdiction. It is F/O that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (ETW)
03/25/2011DISMISSED
03/25/2011REMANDED
03/31/2011MANDATE ISSUED