judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHJANG (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36396
Short Caption:SCHJANG (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 28049
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C87876Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/04/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11630
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36313, 36332, 36336, 36338, 36343, 36374, 36396. Document No. 00-13561.
12/04/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. Mailed on: 11/30/00. 00-21155
12/04/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/31/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-18227
11/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-18328
11/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 29, 2001. 01-18328