judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONNA MARIE RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0179)
Case Number:S-09-0179Case Docketed On:09/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DONNA MARIE RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONNA MARIE RODRIGUEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonna Marie RodriguezDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Probation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 61
Citation:230 P.3d 1111

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/02/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/29/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/04/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/14/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/18/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 5/17/10 by agent for Warden of Wyoming Women's Center.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/02/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/02/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 6/3/10 by agent for Warden of Wyoming Women's Center.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/07/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/4/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal