judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SOUTHWESTERN TITLE AND GUARANTY COMPANY AND AUSTIN TITLE COMPANY, INC., BOARD OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS v. TITLE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION OF TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-4545
A-4545
03/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHWESTERN TITLE AND GUARANTY COMPANY AND AUSTIN TITLE COMPANY, INC., BOARD OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
TITLE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/20/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/24/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/19/1954Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/21/1954Response to Motion filed
12/15/1954Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
11/02/1954Letter Filed
10/25/1954Response to Motion filed
10/20/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/06/1954Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
06/26/1954Response to Motion filed
06/24/1954Motion for Rehearing
06/09/1954Opinion issued
04/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/19/1954Brief on the Merits
03/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
V. F. TaylorAmicus Curiae
Board of Insurance Commissioners of the State of TexasPetitioner
Title Insurance Association of Texas, et al.Respondent
Southwestern Title and Guaranty Company and Austin Title Company, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information