judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD L. SIMEK v. STACY TATE, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM, DECEASED

Case Heading (S-09-0177)
Case Number:S-09-0177Case Docketed On:09/09/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:RONALD L. SIMEK v. STACY TATE, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM, DECEASED
Full Title:RONALD L. SIMEK, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STACY TATE, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM, DECEASED, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald L. SimekAndrea L. Richard
Jennifer Ann Golden
AppelleeStacy TateChris Dull Edwards
William L. Simpson
Larry B. Jones

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2010 WY 65
Citation:231 P.3d 891

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/09/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
09/09/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice GoldenNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/27/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/27/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant re attachments. Told her they may be attached to hardcopy only, will note on cover page.EventPhone CallFinal
10/29/2009Event - Rejected Filing. Viewed "motion to file an amended pleadings." The motion was actually a request for an extension of time to file an errata. Informed office that no extension necessary to file an errata.EventRejected FilingFinal
11/02/2009Event - Rejected Filing. Viewed Notice Incoming - Errata. Document was actually a motion for extension to file errata to correct typographical errors. Left voicemail indicating to counsel again that errata could be submitted w/o motion.EventRejected FilingFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Opening brief of appellant with attachmentsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2009Event - Phone Call. Received call from Ms. Edwards regarding the brief of appellant. "Errata" has not been filed electronically, but additional pages attached to hard copy of brief.EventPhone CallFinal
12/08/2009Event - Phone Call. At court's request, contacted counsel for appellant and requested a motion to file an amended pleading (brief). No time limit, but as soon as reasonably possible. Molly said they will do that.EventPhone CallFinal
12/08/2009Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel for appellee and informed her the court has requested a motion to amend brief from counsel for appellant.EventPhone CallFinal
12/09/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2009Order - Other - Requesting Motion to File Amended Pleading and Order Staying Time to File Brief of AppelleeOrderOtherFinal
12/11/2009Event - Phone Call. Spoke with both counsel regarding court's order on amending pleadings. FAXed copy of order to both counsel this date.EventPhone CallFinal
12/18/2009Motion - Correct a DocumentMotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
12/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to File Amended Pleading. (Hard copies received 7 days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/29/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Objection to Appellant's Motion to File Amended Pleading and Proposed OrderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/05/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Reply in Support of Its Motion to File Amended Pleading and Appellant's Position on Appellee's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/07/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant. Both pleadings filed today were unsigned by counsel. Requested the signed originals be sent. Counsel will mail them.EventPhone CallFinal
01/12/2010Event- Hardcopy received - Signed original copy of Appellant Reply in Support of Its Motion to File Amended Pleading and Appellant's Position on Appellee's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/12/2010Order - Denying Motion to File Amended Pleading (and setting due date for Appellee's brief)OrderDenyFinal
01/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Stacy Tate, Administrator of the Estate of Carol B. BrehmEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/12/2010Order - Assignment of judge - Thomas Campbell, District Judge assigned to act in this matter for Justice Golden.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/16/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry B. Jones for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/22/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Andrea Richard for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke, and Campbell, DJ (Andrea L. Richard for appellant; Chris Dull Edwards and Larry B. Jones, argument by Mr. Jones for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/24/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/14/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/11/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal