judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY OF SPARKS VS. ISTRICE

Case Information: 36393
Short Caption:CITY OF SPARKS VS. ISTRICECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36045
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9906410Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/13/2000 / Rosenauer, CeciliaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11626
07/10/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-12338
07/13/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cecilia Rosenauer. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/13/2000Other Other. On July 7, 2000 a receipt was mailed to all counsel that a filing fee of $200.00 was due from appellant. The City of Sparks is not required to pay a filing fee, therefore, no fee is due.
08/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on July 10, 2000, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK 00-13324
08/02/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.