judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL CORDE JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0135
Short Caption:MICHAEL CORDE JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-3424-10Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/10/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Corde Johnson Y
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Jay Apperson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Warren Gorman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Warren Gorman, Esquire
02/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (39 pgs/tape) 9/10/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (18 pgs/tape) 9/16/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (27 pgs/tape) 9/24/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (11 pgs/tape) 10/13/10 proc. w/cd
03/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/15/2011RECORD COPIES
03/15/2011RECORD INDEX
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/01/2011APPENDIX
04/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 1, 2011 (no oppo)
04/29/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 1, 2011. (JAC)
06/01/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/10/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Fisher, Schwelb
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate