judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TONYA BACON V. WENDELL BACON

Case Information: 06-FM-1531
Short Caption:TONYA BACON V. WENDELL BACONClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3295-05Filed Date:09/12/2006

Opening Event Date:09/12/2006Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/20/2007Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/05/2007
Argued/Submitted:09/30/2008
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/30/2008

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTonya Bacon N
Olekanma A. EkekweYN
AppelleeWendell K. Bacon N
Johnny M. RiddickYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/12/2006NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/08/2007 ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal shouild not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction as having been taken from a non-final order of the Superior Court. See D.C. Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW) lw
01/08/2007TMC - OTSC - appellee's motion to dismiss
02/02/2007APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/05/2007 ORDERED that the ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DISCHARGED to the EXTENT appellant seeks review of the trial court's denial of her petition for a civil protection oder. This is, however, the only order properly before the court. See D.C. Code 11-721 (a)(2)(A)(2001). It is *****MORE*****
02/05/2007 FURTHER ORDERED that appeellee's MOTION TO DISMISS is DENIED AS MOOT. It is *****MORE*****
02/05/2007 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order shall be issued once the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court. (RDKNBE)
02/15/2007STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 9/6/06 - tape (Rt needed/ordered)
02/15/2007RECEIVED Appellant's Brief & Appendix.
08/20/2007RECORD INDEX
08/20/2007SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (12 pgs/tape) 9/6/06 proc.
08/20/2007RECORD COMPLETED
08/23/2007 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP)
10/05/2007 On consideration of this court's order of August 23, 2007, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days from teh date of the order, and it appearing that appelant had loged with this court her brief and appendix on february 15, 2007, it is ORDERED that this court's order of August 23, 2007 is hereby vacated to the extent it directed appellant to file the brief and the appendix. It is F/O that the Clerk shall fiel appellant's lodged brief and the appendix. It is F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
10/05/2007APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/05/2007APPENDIX
11/05/2007APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/05/2007APPENDIX- aple
11/05/2007BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/21/2007APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
11/21/2007RECEIVED- aple's amended brief
12/06/2007ORD GRT APLE MO FOR LV TO FL AMENDED/CORRECTED BRF and the lodged corrected breif is filed. It is F/O that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits diviosn as soon as the calendar permits. (GP)
12/06/2007APPELLEE'S AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
12/10/2007FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
12/21/2007APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF to Appellee's Amended Brief.
07/11/2008 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the months of October 2008 thru December 2008, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by August 18, 2008 of specific dates during that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. Counsel must continue to advise the court of availabilities for subsequent months until this case is in fact set for argument. Note that the calendar is prepared approximately two months in advance, e.g. January calendar set for release at the end of November. The court does not encourage the filing of motions to postpone a scheduled argument. If you do seek a change in a scheduled argument date, your motion should both indicate the opponent's position with respect to your request and alternative dates when you and opposing counsel would be available. You may call the Calendar Clerk prior to filing such a motion for information on dates in the scheduled month when the courtroom is available.(aj) Garland Pinkston, Jr. Clerk
07/25/2008CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
07/30/2008LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING
09/24/2008error
09/30/2008FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/2008ARGUED before Washington,Fisher,Thompson. Olekanma A.Ekekwe Esq.,for appellant Tonya Bacon. Johnny M.Riddick Esq.,for appellee Wendell K. Bacon.
10/08/2008AFFIRMED MOJ (Washington, Fisher, Thompson)
10/22/2008APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR COSTS & ATTORNEY FEES ********PARTIALLY DENIED - SEE 11/25/08 ORDER LW
10/23/2008TMC - appellee's motion for costs/fees
10/30/2008MANDATE ISSUED
11/18/2008RECEIVED Amended Certificate of Service from Appellee (for Petition of Costs & Fees)
11/25/2008 ORDERED that appellee's PETITION FOR COSTS IS GRANTED in the amount of $209.00. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES IS DENIED. (WHFITH)
12/01/2008RECEIVED - oppo to aple's mot for costs & Atty's fees.