judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KATHERINE CALOMIRIS TOMPROS, ET AL V. MARY CALOMIRIS

Case Information: 11-PR-0142
Short Caption:KATHERINE CALOMIRIS TOMPROS, ET AL V. MARY CALOMIRISClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LIT24-09Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/05/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKatherine Calomiris Tompros N
Anthony J. Pagano NN
AppellantJenifer Calomiris N
Steven P. HollmanNY
Laura E. Schabinger NN
AppellantCharles W. Calomiris N
Steven P. HollmanNY
AppelleeMary Calomiris N
Stephen J. O'ConnorNY
Michael F. CurtinNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY of order pending appeal and for administrative stay ******ADMINISTRATIVE STAY ENTERED 2/11/11 LW
02/11/2011On consdieration of appellants' motions for adminstrative stay and stay pending appeal, it is O that the motion for adminstrative stay is granted to the extent that the 1/31/11 order directs LEB to produce all documents.......MORE FO that appellee's opposition is due no later than 2/15/11 5 pm MORE (GLTHTE)
02/11/2011TMC - appellant's motion for stay - oppo (-) - notice
02/15/2011 ORDERED that this court shall await disposition of the motion for stay pending before the Superior Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the administrative stay entered by this court remains in effect pending resolution of the motion for stay pending before the Superior Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Superior Court shall transmit a copy of its order resolving the motion for stay to this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a separate appeal may be filed from any adverse ruling. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' motion for stay shall remain held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (GLTHTE) (jl)
02/15/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - of Sup Crt order relevant to aplt's emergency motion for adminstrative stay and stay of order pending appeal.
02/15/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to aplt's emergency motion for admin stay and stay of order pending appeal.
02/18/2011On consdieration of appellant's motion for staypending appeal, the adminstrative stay entered by this court on February 11, 2011, and the oposition to the motion for stay, it is ORDERED that ths adminstrative stay is hereby vacated. FO that appellant's motion for stay is denied. MORE (GLTHTE)
02/18/2011FO that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order shaow cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, SEE ORDER (GLTHTE)
02/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT-NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
02/18/2011RECEIVED - aplt's reply in support of emergency motion for administrative stay and stay of order pending appeal
03/10/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause dated 2/18/11 (JOINTLY).
03/16/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANTS' RESPONSE to this court's February 18, 2011, OTSC, shall be filed no later than April 11, 2011. (BY: CASTILLO) LW
04/08/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to 5/11/11 joint
04/13/2011 On consideration of the joint motion for extension of time, wherein counsel indicates that the parties are working towards a settlement, it is ORDERED that APPELLANTS' RESPONSE to this court's 2/18/11 OTSC shall be filed on or before May 11, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
05/11/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to 4/13/11 order
05/16/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED to the extent that APPELLANTS shall w/n 30 days FILE A RESPONSE to this court 2/18/11 OTSC if a settlement agreement has not been reached during the allotted time. (CASTILLO) lw
06/14/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to court order of 5/16/11 (Joint aplts and aple)
06/22/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANTS SHALL NO LATER THAN JUNE 30, 2011 either file a response to this court's 2/18/11 OTSC or an appropriate motion. (CASTILLO) LW
06/24/2011RECORD INDEX
06/30/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (Joint)
07/14/2011FiledOrder Granting APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (Joint)
07/14/2011FiledDismissed
08/05/2011FiledMandate