Case Information: 36399 | |||
Short Caption: | LARA VS. BOHMAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41370 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A364623 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/17/2000 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/10/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Potter Law Offices-check no. 15187. | ||
07/10/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-11776 | |
07/17/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
09/11/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 00-15973 | |
09/11/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
09/20/2000 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 00-16577 | |
09/28/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-17169 | |
10/10/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 15, 2000. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. | 00-17878 | |
10/26/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 5/15/00 Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson | 00-18936 | |
11/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal is hereby stayed pending further order of this court. Fn2[The clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket to conform to the caption on this order.] | 00-19598 | |
12/11/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order to Show Cause and Remand to District Court. | 00-21594 | |
01/12/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On December 11, 2000, appellants filed a response to the order to show cause purporting to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. We construe the response as a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal and we grant the motion. " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal, with the parties to bear their own fees and costs." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-00711 | |
01/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |