judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMPBELL VS. CAMPBELL

Case Information: 36398
Short Caption:CAMPBELL VS. CAMPBELLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D238504Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/17/2000 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/10/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/10/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11771
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael L. Peters--check no. 1896.
07/17/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent: Robert L. Eisenberg. 00-12549
07/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Notice of Association of Counsel. 00-12786
09/18/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 3, 2000. 00-16436
10/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-17616
10/04/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/16/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-18271
11/01/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Withdrawal of Appeal. 00-19207
11/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-19800
11/13/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.