judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFERY LEE CARTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0181)
Case Number:S-09-0181Case Docketed On:09/17/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JEFFERY LEE CARTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEFFERY LEE CARTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffrey Lee CarterMichael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2010 WY 136
Citation:241 P.3d 476

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/17/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/02/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/18/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina KerinMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Michael H. Reese for AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/25/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Public DefenderOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
02/02/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/05/2010Order - Grant - third extension of time (no further extensions will be considered)OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
03/22/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael Reese for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/04/2010Correspondence - Incoming other - received copy of letter sent to district court clerk from Ms. Craig regarding the designation of oversized exhibits. They will not be necessary.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/08/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael H. Reese for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Internal - Other - Appellant's name spelled inconsistently in pleadings, caption amended to correctNotice-InternalOtherFinal
10/14/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/01/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/01/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/05/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/2/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal