judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDREW SCOTT DAVIS V. STACEY ELLEN DAVIS

Case Information: 11-FM-0141
Short Caption:ANDREW SCOTT DAVIS V. STACEY ELLEN DAVISClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2720-09Filed Date:01/28/2011

Opening Event Date:01/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/17/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/16/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/05/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/08/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndrew Scott DavisYPro SeN
AppelleeStacey Elena DavisNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 28, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
02/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 6/8/10 8/10/10 8/25/10 8/26/10 8/30/10 10/5/10 11/3/10 (rt. needed)
02/28/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript
04/11/2011RECORD COPIES
04/11/2011RECORD INDEX
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (55 pgs/tape) 6/8/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (151 pgs/tape) 8/25/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (110 pgs/tape) 8/26/10 proc. a.m.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (104 pgs/tape) 8/26/10 proc. p.m.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (103 pgs/tape) 8/30/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (6 pgs/tape) 10/5/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (17 pgs/tape) 11/3/10 proc.
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 180 days
06/23/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. (JAC)
07/22/2011FiledNotice Received from Katherine A. O'Rourke stating that she withdrew from case in superior court w/order granting attached (Appellee)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File for 30 days Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/12/2011FiledOpposition - to aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee)
08/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File for 30 days Brief (Appellant) 9/1/11
09/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellant) (no appdx)
09/09/2011FiledOrder directing motion for leave and appendix
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
10/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)
10/19/2011FiledReceived Appendix to Brief (Appellant)
11/16/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/16/2011FiledAppendix (Aple) (attached to brief) (Appellee)
11/16/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/14/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals - 11-FM-141 & 11-FM-1426
12/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record #8 (24-pgs/tape 10/3/11 proc.)w/cd
01/04/2012FiledRecord Index (11-fm-1426)
01/04/2012FiledRecord Copies (11-fm-1426)
01/17/2012FiledRecord Completed - 11-FM-1426
01/20/2012FiledBriefing Order
02/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/21/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
03/13/2012FiledOrder Denying w/o Prejudice Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) & directing appellant to file 10(e) motion
06/06/2012FiledOrder directing appellant to advise court of 10(e) motion
06/19/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From Appellant
07/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/21/2012FiledOrder directing motion, brief & appendix
09/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/18/2012FiledOpposition to Appellants Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
10/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) - 10/22/12
10/25/2012FiledMotion to de consolidate cases (Appellant)Denied
11/26/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion to de consolidate cases (Appellant)
12/07/2012FiledAnswer/Response to the continued extension of time granted (Appellee)
12/18/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal case 11-FM-1426 (Appellant)Granted
01/07/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal case 11-FM-1426 (Appellant)
01/14/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
01/31/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/19/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File to file motion for oral argument (Appellant)
02/19/2013FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Denied
02/19/2013FiledChange Of Address Received From (Appellant)
02/27/2013FiledOrder Denying aplt's pro se motion for oral argument.
03/05/2013FiledSubmitted To Judges Easterly,McLeese,Ferren.
07/16/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Easterly and McLeese, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
08/08/2013FiledMandate