Case Information: 05-CV-1517 | |||
Short Caption: | ATLANTIC HEALTH SERVICES V. CARMEL KALUNGA | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB1834-98 | Filed Date: | 12/13/2005 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/13/2005 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/12/2006 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/24/2006 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Atlantic Health Services Incorporated | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | Carmel Kalunga | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/13/2005 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
01/04/2006 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO RT) lw | |||
01/04/2006 | STATEMENT - of aplt 10(a) statement of issues on appeal | |||
01/05/2006 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 13, 2005, it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index as required by D.C. App. R. 11(a)(3)(A). (GP) elp | |||
01/12/2006 | RECORD INDEX | |||
01/12/2006 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
01/17/2006 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (BY: GP) | |||
02/21/2006 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days | |||
03/08/2006 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before March 29, 2006. (GP) elp | |||
03/29/2006 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
03/29/2006 | APPENDIX - aplt Vol I thru III | |||
04/25/2006 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/12/06 | |||
04/26/2006 | On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 12, 2006. (GP) elp | |||
06/14/2006 | On consideration of this court's order of April 26, 2006, granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before June 12, 2006, and it appearing that the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (GP) elp | |||
06/21/2006 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 7/31/06 | |||
06/26/2006 | On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 31, 2006. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (GP) elp | |||
08/01/2006 | STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL | |||
08/02/2006 | On consideration of the line of dismissal filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. Each party to bear its own costs and fees. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b)(2). (MWF) elp | |||
08/02/2006 | DISMISSED | |||
08/24/2006 | MANDATE ISSUED |