judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. E. MURRAY JONES v. D. O. LAWSON, C. R. SCOTT, ET AL.

Case: A-4562
A-4562
03/10/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. E. MURRAY JONES
D. O. LAWSON, C. R. SCOTT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/05/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/25/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/25/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/15/1954Response to Motion filed
05/05/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/25/1954Response to Petition
03/25/1954Response to Petition
03/15/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. R. Scott, et al.Respondent
D. O. LawsonRespondent
Mrs. E. Murray JonesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information