judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEDIST GIRMA V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CV-0139
Short Caption:KEDIST GIRMA V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5961-10Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKedist Girma YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/23/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 7, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index/record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
03/03/2011RECORD INDEX
03/03/2011RECORD COPIES
03/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/08/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/20/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 8, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by amotion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failureeither to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
04/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and ext of time to file appendix. no oppo
04/28/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief.
05/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to file the lodged brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellant is filed. It is (MORE)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the limited appendix remains due to be filed with this court on or before May 10, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 2, 2011, which directed appellant to file the limited appendix with this court on or before May 10, 2011, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
06/14/2011DISMISSED
07/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED