judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOWN OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT v. LONNIE PORTER

Case Heading (S-09-0178)
Case Number:S-09-0178Case Docketed On:09/10/2009
Linked To: S-10-0133
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:TOWN OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT v. LONNIE PORTER
Full Title:TOWN OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, Appellant (Defendant), v. LONNIE PORTER, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTown of Evansville Police DepartmentJudith A. W. Studer
AppelleeLonnie PorterKeith Robert Nachbar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Appellate Procedure, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 86
Citation:256 P.3d 476

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/10/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/10/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/17/2009Order - Stay briefing - premature notification that appeal was ready to docket. Agreed statement to be filed.OrderStay briefingFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court upon filing of Statement of EvidenceNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter resuming appealNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/16/2009Motion - Other - Motion to take Judicial Notice or for remandMotionOtherFinal
11/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Motion for Court to take Judicial Notice of Applicable Ordinance or, in the Alternative, for Remand for Further Proceedings and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/03/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
12/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for the Court to Take Judicial Notice of Applicable Ordinance or, in the Alternative, for Remand for Further Proceedings.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2009Order - Denying Motion to Take Judicial Notice, Order Denying Motion for Remand and Order Staying BriefingOrderDenyFinal
02/05/2010Event - Other - Failure to apprise Court of the status of Rule 60(b) motion.EventOtherFinal
02/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
02/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Status ReportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Letter from District Judge re Status Report filed in Supreme CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
02/18/2010Correspondence - Incoming - Copy of letter to District Judge requesting hearing.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/19/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order denying motion for relief from order filed 4/15/10 in Natrona County District Court.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
05/03/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, hard copies received, letter needs to be e-filed.EventPhone CallFinal
05/03/2010Correspondence - IncomingCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/11/2010Event - Phone Call - received call from district court regarding status of case and what course to take - advised that we will wait until notified by the district court that the second appeal is ready to be docketed and then the stay will be lifted.EventPhone CallFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Other - Second appeal is docketed and briefing is resumedNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
08/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Lonnie PorterEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2010Order - Consolidating cases for argument and decisionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/23/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant, Town of Evansville Police DepartmentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Keith Nachbar for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Judith Studer for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/03/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/09/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Judith A.W. Studer for appellant; Keith Robert Nachbar for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/01/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with directions, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/01/2011Motion - Withdraw a Document. Actually a motion to dimiss appeals.MotionWithdraw a documentFinal
06/07/2011Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel and requested original and six copies of stipulated motion to withdraw a document (dismiss appeals).EventPhone CallFinal
06/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Withdrawal of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2011Order on Stipulated Withdrawal of AppealOrderOtherFinal
07/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/06/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/5/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/11/2011Correspondence - Incoming other. Received copy of letter to counsel from Judge Sullins regarding Order on Remand.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal