judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG VS. WINIARSKI

Case Information: 36395
Short Caption:SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG VS. WINIARSKICourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36490 , 40126
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A378591Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/17/2000 / Lavelle, EleissaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Barker firm-check no. 2913.
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11628
07/17/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa Lavelle. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/07/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-07639
05/07/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
05/21/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-08391
05/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-08535
05/23/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-08669
06/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Appellant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 36395/36490. 01-10049
06/21/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 36395/36490. 01-10477
09/12/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Appellant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.'s Motion for Stay or in the Alternative, an Extension of Time to file its Opening Brief. 01-15383
09/25/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay or in the Alternative, an Extension of Time to file its Opening Brief. 01-16146
10/02/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We deny appellant's motion to consolidate these appeals, and the motion to stay briefing or extend the briefing schedule in Docket No. 36395, as the motions are moot.] SNP02-WM/DA/ML 01-16594
10/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16637
10/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2001. 01-16637