judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDEN (MARC) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36388
Short Caption:EDEN (MARC) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0239Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/06/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-11543
07/25/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 5, 2000. Court Reporter: Kate Murray. 00-12903
08/02/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13377
08/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-13378
08/24/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14894
10/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, " . . . the order of the district court is affirmed." fn1[On appeal, appellant contends that the district court abused its discretion at sentencing. This issue was not raised below. We therefore decline to consider it.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17435
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17519
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 3, 2000. 00-17519