judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVIN TAYLOR v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0170)
Case Number:S-09-0170Case Docketed On:08/31/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:KEVIN TAYLOR v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:KEVIN TAYLOR, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKevin TaylorDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 170
Citation:233 P.3d 583 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/31/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/31/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
10/19/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/04/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/22/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/23/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant Kevin Taylor.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/09/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/14/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
06/15/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellee, State has no objection to attorney fees requestEventPhone CallFinal
06/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/22/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/01/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/29/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal