judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ASAHEL L. ABRAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0128
Short Caption:ASAHEL L. ABRAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-1315-10Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAsahel L. AbramsYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mona A. Sahaf YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Matthew C. Leefer, Equire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Matthew C. Leefer, Esquire
02/25/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (85 pgs/Kaczorowski) 9/16/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (211 pgs/Graybill) 9/20-21/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (8 pgs/tape) 11/5/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (10 pgs/tape) 1/7/11 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (18 pgs/tape) 1/20/11 proc. w/cd
05/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/05/2011RECORD COPIES
05/05/2011RECORD INDEX
05/05/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (order sealing bench conf) ***SEALED***
05/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until September 27, 2011 (no oppo)
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 27, 2011. (Castillo)
09/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/26/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/06/2012FiledSubmitted To Oberly,Easterly,King
04/11/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Easterly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
04/24/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
05/03/2012WithdrawnMandate************RECALLED PER 5/14/12 ORDER
05/07/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and Motion For Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing/ Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Granted
05/07/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE and EXTEND TIME TO FILE A PFRH
05/14/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Recall Mandate and GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME to the extent that any PETITION FOR REHEARING/EN BANC SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 30 DAYS FROM THIS ORDER
04/11/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
04/11/2013FiledMandate