judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZAMORA (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36389
Short Caption:ZAMORA (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P0662Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/06/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-11544
07/25/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: October 28, 1999. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 00-12905
08/03/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13463
08/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-13464
08/22/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14721
10/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, " . . . the order of the district court is affirmed." fn2[On appeal, appellant also contends that his trial counsel was ineffective for failing to raise the procuring agent defense. This issue was not raised below. We therefore decline to consider it.] SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-18094
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18184
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-18184