judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM: RONALD L. SIMEK v. STACY TATE, Administrator of the Estate of Carol B. Brehm

Case Heading (S-09-0171)
Case Number:S-09-0171Case Docketed On:08/31/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM: RONALD L. SIMEK v. STACY TATE, Administrator of the Estate of Carol B. Brehm
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM: RONALD L. SIMEK, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STACY TATE, Administrator of the Estate of Carol B. Brehm, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald L. SimekAndrea L. Richard
Jennifer Ann Golden
AppelleeStacy TateChris Dull Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/31/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court. District Court Clerk informed Court that counsel for Appellant has failed to file transcripts.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/31/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memoNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
09/02/2009Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re transcript, there was no hearing to be reported.EventPhone CallFinal
10/20/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
10/20/2009Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
10/22/2009Event - Phone Call to office counsel for Appellant, received copies of rejected pleading, not filed.EventPhone CallFinal
10/26/2009Event - Phone Call, received second set of rejected pleading in mail, a second mailing was inadvertently mailed out. Office is aware pleading was rejectedEventPhone CallFinal
11/05/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal