judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DIEGO FERNANDO MARTINEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0127
Short Caption:DIEGO FERNANDO MARTINEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-15302-06Filed Date:02/02/2011

Opening Event Date:02/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDiego Fernando Martinez Y
Sandi S. Rhee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sandi Rhee, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sandi Rhee, Esquire
03/09/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/09/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (16 pgs/Zamora) 1/13/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (25 pgs/Drurry) 1/24/11 proc. w/cd
09/01/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/01/2011FiledRecord Index
09/01/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/03/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/18/2011FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/in 20 days.
12/22/2011FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
01/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/28/2012FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to file the motion to unseal the requested transcript in the trial court w/n 10 days.
04/17/2012FiledAppellant's response to the 3/28/12 order.
04/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (for RT reasons)
05/20/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (34 pgs/tape) 1/13/10 proc ***SEALED***
06/27/2013FiledBriefing Order
08/06/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/19/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and the lodged brief and the limited appendix are filed. Appellee's brief due w/n 30 days.
08/23/2013FiledOrdered that this court's order of August 19, 2013, order is hereby vacated to the extent it directed appellee's brief
08/29/2013FiledORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO FILE A RESPONSE TO COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) NO LATER THAN 9/20/13 and HOLDING COUNSEL'S MOTION IN ABEYANCE
08/29/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
10/11/2013FiledORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) and SS, the CLERK SHALL FILE the MOTION and BREIF UNDER SEAL
10/11/2013FiledMOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) w/attached brief (Appellant)
10/11/2013FiledAffirmed
11/05/2013FiledMandate