judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEIGHTAL VS. PEIGHTAL

Case Information: 34630
Short Caption:PEIGHTAL VS. PEIGHTALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D220026Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/1999 / Christensen, CarlSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harold Gewerter--Western Union M.O. No. 02-924274520.
08/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07241
08/16/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carl J. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-09381
11/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Per NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge indicates that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant shall have 15 days to file the docketing statement. Deadlines for requesting/preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant0. 99-10812
11/18/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-11460
08/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days. 00-14598
09/21/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-16675
03/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Having considered appellant's response, we conclude that this appeal may proceed. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall thereafter proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-05407
07/10/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve the transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal. 01-11624
07/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/2/99. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 01-11636
07/11/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for request for transcripts. 01-11694
07/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-12525
08/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on July 24, 2001, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP.CLK 01-13191
08/06/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
08/23/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. -- Attorney Philip Beuth. (No action required.) 01-14336