judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JUSTIN DREW JANPOL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0036)
Case Number:S-07-0036Case Docketed On:02/16/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JUSTIN DREW JANPOL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JUSTIN DREW JANPOL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJustin Drew JanpolDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 21
Citation:178 P.3d 396

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/16/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/03/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/04/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/18/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/03/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/06/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/06/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
09/18/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/10/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volumes III-IV, transcripts; Volume V, confidential information.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling on behalf of Appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/28/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/17/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/17/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/19/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/18/08 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal