judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YOUNG, CLARENCE L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0938
Short Caption:YOUNG, CLARENCE L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/31/1980

Opening Event Date:07/31/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/09/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/15/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Gregory B. Macaulay YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel M. Cisin YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YOUNG, CLARENCE L. UNITED STATES
07/31/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/09/1982FiledRecord Completed
12/15/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/21/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/30/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition