judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES L. BALL v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0165)
Case Number:S-09-0165Case Docketed On:08/26/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:JAMES L. BALL v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:JAMES L. BALL, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames L. BallGeorge Santini
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Cara Boyle Chambers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 128
Citation:239 P.3d 621

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/26/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
08/26/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/26/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
08/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - motion filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/11/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
10/08/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance filed in District Court by Cara Boyle ChambersNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/23/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/25/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/14/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/17/2009Motion - Oral argument - reassignment from expedited docketMotionOral argument - reassignment from brief only docketFinal
12/28/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/04/2010Event - Phone Call - Called Mr. Santani's office to request the original and six copies of the motion e-filed on 12/17/09.EventPhone CallFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Reassignment to Oral Argument DocketEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Granting reassignment to argument docketOrderGranting reassignment to argument docketFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cara Chambers for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/19/2010Motion - Other - Motion to vacate and reset oral argument.MotionOtherFinal
01/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cara Boyle Chambers for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - George Santini for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (George Santini for appellant; James Michael Causey, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Cara Boyle Chambers, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Chambers for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/27/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
09/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for payments of attorney's fees & costs; and affidavit of Robert A. Nicholas.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
10/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/26/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/29/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/28/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal