judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICARDO C. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0132
Short Caption:RICARDO C. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-1625-07Filed Date:01/20/2011

Opening Event Date:01/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/19/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/20/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicardo C. Thompson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Travis A. Hill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL mailed 1/20/11
02/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 20, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
02/16/2011RECORD INDEX
02/16/2011RECORD COPIES
02/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
03/17/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/25/2011TMC - motion for appointment of counsel
04/04/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*******
04/04/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 15 DAYS submit the LIMITED APPENDIX, W/A motion for leave to file out of time...It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed w/n 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (RDKRTE) (rm)
04/18/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
04/18/2011RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief attached to Motion for Leave.
05/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/04/2011APPENDIX
05/31/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days after receipt of transcripts
06/28/2011NOTICE RECEIVED- from aple re: transcripts (counsel has received transcripts)dfe
07/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (21 pgs/tape) 5/29/07 proc.
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (11 pgs/tape) 8/2/07 proc w/cd
07/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION to Appellee's Motion to Extend Time to File Brief; Opposition included in the motion (Served by: DCCA on 7/8/11).
07/19/2011FiledMotion for Transcripts (Appellant)Granted
08/12/2011FiledMotion for Discovery (Served by: DCCA on 8/12/11) (Appellant)Denied
08/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to the extent that the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellee and granting appellant's motion for a copy of the transcript and providing a copy of the May 29, 2007 and August 2, 2007 transcripts to appellant and denying appellant's motion for discovery and this case shall be scheduled for considertion before a merits division as soon as the calender permits
08/19/2011FiledBrief. (Appellee)
08/19/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/21/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
01/04/2012FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion to present oral argument.
01/31/2012FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Easterly,Ferren
02/09/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
03/01/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
04/12/2012FiledORDER denying appellant's petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc.
04/17/2012FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)
04/20/2012FiledMandate
04/23/2012LodgedMotion to amend the petition for rehearing (Appellant)
05/25/2012FiledLetter To appellant Ricardo C. Thompson advising him of the status of his appeal, and returning his pleadings.