judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GULF BITULITHIC COMPANY, ET AL. v. HOUSTON NATURAL GAS CORPORATION

Case: A-4563
A-4563
03/16/1954
Application for Writ of Error
GULF BITULITHIC COMPANY, ET AL.
HOUSTON NATURAL GAS CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/26/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/22/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/15/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/20/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/26/1954Response to Brief filed
04/22/1954Brief in Support of Petition
04/19/1954Response to Motion filed
04/15/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/20/1954Response to Petition
03/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/16/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gulf Bitulithic Company, et al.Petitioner
Houston Natural Gas CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information