judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARTFORD FIRE INS. VS. CONTRACT MFG. C/W 35845

Case Information: 36383
Short Caption:HARTFORD FIRE INS. VS. CONTRACT MFG. C/W 35845Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 35845 *, 36383Related Case(s): 33893 , 35845 , 43913
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A367706Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice MaupinPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/10/2000 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/10/2003 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/10/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
07/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton Jemison Cobeaga & List--check no. 076446.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11413
07/10/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/15/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. With the concurrence of all counsel, the Settlement Judge recommends this appeal be removed from the settlement conference program, pending a decision on respondent's motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction in Supreme Court Case No. 35845. 00-21962
08/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge, and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program, pending a decision on respondent's motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed in Docket No. 35845. Upon the resolution of such motion, settlement conference proceedings in this appeal shall resume. 01-14212
03/27/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-05447
04/16/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these matters. We reinstate the time deadlines for filing the docketing statement, requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement in Docket No. 36383. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to the Beckley firm and the Parker firm, counsel for appellant in Docket No. 36383.) Nos. 35845/36383. (02-06747)
05/03/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Filed in 36383 only. Beckley, Singleton, Chtd. Nos. 36383/35845. 02-07797
06/06/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-09893).
06/19/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 29, 1999; August 17, 2001, and August 24, 2001. To Court Reporter: Janice Liston. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-10649).
06/24/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 03/29/00; 09/17/01; and 09/ 24/01 Court Reporter: Janice Liston. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-10891).
06/24/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Transcripts requested: 03/29/99; 09/17/01; and 09/24/01. To Court Reporter: Janice Liston. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-10896).
08/15/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 16, 2002. Nos. 35845/36383 [02-13988]
09/17/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 09/16/02. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-16173).
09/17/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 4. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-16174).
10/07/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 10/04/02. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-17239).
10/07/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-17240).
11/08/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 5, 2002. Nos. 35845/36383 (02-19303).
12/09/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on 12/05/02. Nos. 35845/36383.
04/28/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 10, 2003, at 10:30 a.m. (NNP03-RR/WM/MG) (Nos. 35845 and 36383)
05/27/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (Nos. 35845 and 36383)
06/09/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Nos. 35845/36383.
06/10/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03-DA/RR/MG. Nos. 35845/36383.
08/25/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand for Docket No. 35845 and Order Dismissing Appeal for Docket No. 36383. 'We dismiss Hartford's appeal from the order denying the motion to set aside the default because the arguments raised in that appeal are different from the arguments raised in the appeal from the default judgment, and because that appeal is moot in light of our decision regarding the default judgment.' NNP03-DA/RR/MG. Nos. 35845/36383. 03-14220
09/19/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-14378
09/19/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/01/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 22, 2003. 03-14378